Trustees VOICES OF HOPE
Charity number: 1187454

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keath Wayne Gaitskell | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JAYNE JARVIS | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca-Anne Harrington | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Anthony Harrington | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Vernon | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeevan Mahesan | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.