THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR DEVELOPMENTAL ORIGINS OF HEALTH AND DISEASE / DOHAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve & protect health & relieve sickness in particular but not exclusively by: Promoting the co-ordination of a research strategy in different countries for the scientific exploration of early development in relation to chronic disease in later life. Promoting the development and application of public health strategies to prevent chronic disease. Supporting educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Italy
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Peru
- Poland
- Portugal
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turkey
- Uganda
- United States
- Uruguay
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 July 2020: CIO registration
- 17 January 2022: Funds received from 1116722 THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR DEVELOPMENTAL ORIGIN...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Lucilla Poston | Chair | 10 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Professor Nuruddin Mohammed | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Torsten Plosch | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shane Anthony Norris PhD | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK HANSON | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CAROLINE HANNAH DOROTHY FALL DM FRCP | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.99k | £27.01k | £47.65k | £76.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.07k | £29.26k | £82.51k | £34.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROMOTING THE CO-ORDINATION OF A RESEARCH STRATEGY IN DIFFERENT COUNTRIES FOR THE SCIENTIFIC EXPLORATION OF EARLY DEVELOPMENT IN RELATION TO CHRONIC DISEASE IN LATER LIFE. 2) PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH STRATEGIES TO PREVENT CHRONIC DISEASE. 3) SUPPORTING EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT TO ACHIEVE THESE OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOHaD Society
KCL Dept Women & Childrens Health
10th Floor
North Wing
249 Westminster Bridge Road
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07542361783
- Email:
- office@dohadsoc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window