NEDCARE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NEDCare CIO (North East Dartmoor Care Charitable Incorporated Organisation) exists to support people who need care and support at home in North East Dartmoor. NEDCare provides domiciliary care services that are regulated by the Care Quality Commission. NEDCare covers the three GP surgery areas of Cheriton Bishop, Chagford and Moretonhampstead.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £170,264 from 2 government contract(s) and £4,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 09 June 2020: CIO registration
- 08 March 2023: Funds received from 1116047 THE CHARLES AND ALISON MCGREGOR CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HOWARD WILLIS | Chair | 09 June 2020 |
|
|||||
John Hubbard | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sue Butler-Cole | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill French | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Myfanwy Porter | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mitchell | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE BATES | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £399.89k | £389.69k | £299.60k | £285.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £360.15k | £392.66k | £301.04k | £300.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £119.71k | £164.57k | £134.11k | £170.26k | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.52k | £32.63k | £5.89k | £4.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, OR DISABILITY, IN THE NORTH EAST DARTMOOR AREA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: - A) DOMICILIARY SOCIAL CARE INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PERSONAL CARE TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS WITH ACTIVITIES SUCH AS GETTING OUT OF BED, BATHING AND DRESSING; B) PRACTICAL SUPPORT WITH DAY-TO-DAY LIVING INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUPPORT IN THE PREPARATION OF MEALS AND DRINKS TO MAINTAIN NUTRITION AND HYDRATION, MANAGING MEDICATIONS, SHOPPING FOR FOOD, AND ACCESSING ACTIVITIES IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3A The Square
Moretonhampstead
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 8NF
- Phone:
- 01647279211
- Email:
- info@nedcare.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window