Accounts and annual returns THE AUDENSHAW HIGH SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 515327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 May 2024 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required