Financial history GUJARATI ARYA ASSOCIATION, LEICESTER

Charity number: 515332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £90.55k £75.66k £77.29k £100.68k £101.24k
Total expenditure £71.21k £45.80k £29.82k £37.37k £46.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.27k £27.36k N/A N/A