TRAFFIKANALYSIS HUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To use technology to find and disrupt human trafficking
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Austria
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Colombia
- France
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Netherlands
- Romania
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 29 December 2020: Standard registration
- TRAFFIK ANALYSIS HUB (Previous name)
- TRAFFIK ANALYSIS HUB (Previous name)
- TRAFFIK ANALYSIS HUB LTD (Previous name)
- TRAFFIKANALYSIS2018 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS BERNARD FRANK FISHWICK | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Angela Henderson | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Miller | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Dearnley | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.97k | £518.80k | £216.65k | £181.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.10k | £429.16k | £350.05k | £170.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £289.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £229.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £426.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £2.96k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS"') ARE TO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 PROTECT THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC FROM HUMAN TRAFFICKING; AND 3.1.2 PREVENT THE CRIME OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING; IN EACH CASE BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) FACILITATING THE SHARING OF DATA IN A SECURE TRUSTED ENVIRONMENT ACROSS AS MANY INDUSTRIES, ORGANISATIONS, SECTORS AND LOCATIONS AS REASONABLY POSSIBLE IN ORDER TO BUILD A DEEPER UNDERSTANDING OF HOW HUMAN TRAFFICKING IS ORGANISED, FUNDED AND PERPETUATED AND UTILISING SUCH DATA TO ANALYSE HUMAN TRAFFICKING; (B) EDUCATING AND RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING ITS PREVENTION, CAUSES, MANIFESTATIONS, DESTRUCTIVE EFFECTS AND ADVERSE CONSEQUENCES; (C) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO HUMAN TRAFFICKING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (D) ELIMINATING THE INFRINGEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS BY WAY OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING; AND (E) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE FURTHERS THE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STOP THE TRAFFIK
35-41 Lower Marsh
LONDON
SE1 7RL
- Phone:
- 02079214258
- Email:
- admin@traffikanalysis.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window