THE RUSSIAN BALLET SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Russian Ballet Society was founded to promote the teaching of the Legat System of Ballet, a dynamic and artistic style created by Nicolas Legat. The Legat System of Classical Ballet is a free-flowing style with a strong basic technique, developed through a constant variation of sequences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cyprus
- Greece
- Italy
- Japan
- Malta
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Thailand
Governance
- 14 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Dear Melvin | Chair | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annie Henschel | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Ghosh | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jamila Al Adwani | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ENZA BACCIALE | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yng-Wong Helen | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Adamou | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Gibbs | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Moubayed | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.22k | £16.15k | £30.22k | £35.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.03k | £25.48k | £36.89k | £41.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE FINE ART OF RUSSIAN BALLET IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE RUSSIAN CLASSICAL SCHOOL AND STYLE (AS TAUGHT BY NOVERRE-VESTRIS-BOURNOVILLE (PERE AND FILS) - JOHANSSEN - PETIPA - LEGAT) FOR THE BENEFIT AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC BY:- A) PRESERVING AND UPHOLDING THE TRUE TRADITIONS AND HIGH PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS OF RUSSIAN BALLET; B) PROVIDING TRAINING TO BOTH: A. STUDENTS WISHING TO ATTAIN A PROFESSIONAL STANDARD; AND B. TEACHERS WISHING TO TEACH THE FINE ART OF RUSSIAN BALLET C) PROVIDING EXAMINATIONS AND AWARDING CERTIFICATES WHICH SHALL BE ACCEPTED BY THE PROFESSION AND THE PUBLIC AS VALID GUARANTEE OF TECHNICAL MASTERY; AND D) PROVIDING EDUCATION IN THE FORM OF PERIODICAL CLASSES, LECTURES AND DEMONSTRATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF ASSOCIATES AND MEMBERS AND ANYONE FROM THE WIDER PUBLIC WITH A GENUINE INTEREST IN THE ART OF BALLET AND IN THE PRESERVATION OF QUALITY OF RUSSIAN BALLET TAUGHT TO THE NEXT GENERATION AND GENERATIONS TO FOLLOW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 WALDEGRAVE ROAD
BRIGHTON
BN1 6GE
- Phone:
- 07749832344
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window