THE BRIDGEND MASONIC LODGES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poor and distressed brother masons or their poor and distressed widows or children or to or for the benefit of such Masonic charities or other exclusively charitable institutions, societies and objects as the lodge shall in duly constituted metings from time to time direct
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 27 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARRAN MORDECAI | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Aubrey | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry George Edwards | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonothan David Hughes | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Charles Adams | Trustee | 07 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DYFRIG EDAWRDS | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.67k | £54.07k | £114.81k | £109.00k | £90.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.68k | £45.77k | £74.53k | £80.69k | £74.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | £8.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MAY 1984
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masonic Hall
Coychurch Road
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF31 2AP
- Phone:
- 01656657873
- Email:
- 1secretarybmlct@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window