WAKEFIELD DISTRICT CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a wide variety of weekly events aimed at asylum seekers and refugees (ASRs) in our area. Through these events, mostly in the form of "drop-ins" we are able to provide a welcome, and a point of contact for help, advice and support with volunteers from many local voluntary, community and faith organisations. We also work to make our City more welcoming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Edward James Baldwin | Chair | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Sanderson | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Weston Dandawa Mucheriwa | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siegfried Gerhard Breuning | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Willis Davies | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.50k | £97.57k | £70.63k | £30.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.05k | £85.58k | £65.06k | £57.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.50k | £20.62k | £24.00k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 21 JAN 2020 AMENDED ON 17 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
A) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY EDUCATING AND INFORMING ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO ASYLUM-SEEKERS AND REFUGEES. B) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING VOLUNTARY, COMMUNITY AND FAITH ORGANISATIONS TO WELCOME ASYLUM-SEEKERS AND REFUGEES ENABLING THEM TO ACCESS COMMUNITY FACILITIES, ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY, AND SO AID THEIR INTEGRATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY. C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG THOSE WHO ARE SEEKING OR HAVE SOUGHT ASYLUM, REFUGEES, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, AND PEOPLE SUFFERING POVERTY AND HARDSHIP IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY, BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER MATERIAL SUPPORT, INTERPRETING / TRANSLATING / ADVOCACY / HEALTH / HOUSING ADVICE AND EDUCATION. D) TO HELP ASYLUM-SEEKERS AND REFUGEES ADAPT TO LIFE IN THE UK BY: ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND HELPING THEM TO ACCESS FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS.?
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Michaels Welcome Centre
Westgate Common
WAKEFIELD
Wakefield
WF2 9RW
- Phone:
- 07800605397
- Email:
- secretary@wdcos.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window