WILDWOOD CHURCH

Charity Number: 515346
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Works with Newfrontiers and Stafford Churches. Sunday services include worship, bible teaching and Faith club for children. The Gateway provides detached youth work, health and community services, drop-in all ages ,Knit & Natter group. Friday drop-in for elderly , Activity-in-Age fitness class, youth activities. Overseas aid to Liberia, Samaritans Purse

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019

Total income: £58,461
Total expenditure: £218,029

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Liberia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 1984: Standard registration
  • 13 October 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 13 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1169325 WILDWOOD CHURCH STAFFORD
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WILDWOOD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (STAFFORD) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £190.74k £210.47k £191.74k £181.66k £58.46k
Total expenditure £203.91k £185.91k £201.91k £159.49k £218.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.46k £4.24k £14.45k £1.94k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 February 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 April 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 March 2018 On Time