METAMORPHOSIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Metamorphosis Foundation provides grants to charities & organisations [but not individuals] involved in the conservation sector & improvement of the physical & natural environment. We look in particular, but not exclusively to support organisations who can facilitate training and professional development in the sector for those who otherwise have difficulty in accessing such opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Botswana
- Eswatini
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 11 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Simon John Thornton | Chair | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Eric Rotherham | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Louise Thornton | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.75k | £10.00k | £240.01k | £700 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.75k | £50.72k | £72.99k | £76.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES TOWARDS TRAINING AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
246 Melton Road
Edwalton
Nottingham
NG12 4AG
- Phone:
- 01159452449
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window