Accounts and annual returns MECCA MOSQUE

Charity Number: 515359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 30 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 30 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 23 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 06 October 2023 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 06 October 2023 189 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 March 2023 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 March 2023 335 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 January 2023 653 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 13 January 2023 653 days late Download Open in new window