Accounts and annual returns DURRANI TRUST

Charity number: 1187043
Charity reporting is overdue by 552 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
Annual return 01 January 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 552 days
Annual return 01 January 2022 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 17 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2021 21 March 2022 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 17 May 2022 197 days late Download Open in new window