GRASSLAND HASMOOR FUTURES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of charitable services to promote the community regeneration of Grassmoor and Hasland, and the north eastern area of Derbyshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £91,658 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 26 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Matthew Brady | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES WRIGHT | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Trudy Elaine Ford | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles McGeever | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Dunks | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT RYAN FOX | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARIC | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Arrandale | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Wall-Billyeald | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.96k | £147.39k | £96.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.29k | £126.29k | £87.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £154.79k | £550 | £91.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF GRASLAND HASMORE AND SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ASSISTING IN THE ADMINISTRATION OF FUNDING PROGRAMMES TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, MONITORING FOR GRANTS, RECOMMENDING GRANTS, ASSISTING IN APPLICATIONS FOR GRANTS 2. THE COMPANY OBJECTS SHALL BE TO PROMOTE URBAN AND RURAL IMPROVEMENTS, PARTICULARLY IN GRASSMOOR AND HASLAND, AND NORTH EASTERN DERBYSHIRE, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGES; B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR THIRD SECTOR PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE; H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; J) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; M) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN THEIR COMMUNITY; AND N)SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
HASLAND WORKING MENS CLUB
HAMPTON STREET
CHESTERFIELD
S41 0LH
- Phone:
- 07709483625
- Email:
- dave.dtbservices@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window