Trustees GRASSLAND HASMOOR FUTURES LTD
Charity Number: 1192538

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Matthew Brady | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES WRIGHT | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Trudy Elaine Ford | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles McGeever | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Dunks | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT RYAN FOX | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MARIC | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Arrandale | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Wall-Billyeald | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.