Linked charities CONGREGATION OF LA RETRAITE CIO
Charity number: 1189341

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JULY 1973 AND AMENDED ON 29TH JUNE 1998.
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 APR 2021
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 27 APR 2021
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION OF LA RETRAITE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 14 September 1973 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.