POP ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
POP ARTS PURPOSES: To advance the education of young people with Special Educational Needs and Disabilities (SEND) and/or disadvantaged young people (i.e. Looked After Children and/or young people in receipt of Pupil Premium funding) within the United Kingdom, through the encouragement of the arts including, without any limitation, film, animation, drama, dance, singing and music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Thomas | Chair | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Leckie | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Corby | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Withnall | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.02k | £37.17k | £12.31k | £27.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.29k | £34.62k | £24.68k | £13.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES (SEND) AND/OR DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE (I.E. LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN AND/OR YOUNG PEOPLE IN RECEIPT OF PUPIL PREMIUM FUNDING) WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, THROUGH THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING, WITHOUT ANY LIMITATION, FILM, ANIMATION, DRAMA, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE. (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES, WHICH DEVELOP SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ghost Town Studios
39 Markfield Road
South Tottenham
LONDON
N15 4QA
- Phone:
- 07766810038
- Email:
- contact@poparts.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window