NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church services & house groups for worship, learning, mutual support in Yeadon and surrounding areas. Pre-school group for carers and toddlers. We give money & support both locally & across the world for outreach, development and disaster relief. We put on outreach events in the community, teaching events for Christians and provide premises for local community events and churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 09 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Robinson | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Geoff Newton | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Patricia Williams | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Mario Cordeiro | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonas TomKus | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Carol Jean Comrie | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHNSON DANIEL-SAM | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Denise Arnott | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £85.18k | £100.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £90.02k | £107.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; (2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH. AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS, SERVICES OF ANY KIND, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH
HAW LANE
YEADON
LEEDS
LS19 7XQ
- Phone:
- 07880334822
- Email:
- pat.williams1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.