THE SHANTY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity raising funds to alleviate poverty and disadvantage amongst marginalised communities in Kolkata, India. This is achieved by i) empowering women through livelihood support and education, ii) educational support and sponsorship for children through school and higher education iii) emergency food and medical relief for families in crisis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
Governance
- 24 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE MANSON | Chair | 16 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Emma Boot | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cassidy | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chantal McMurdie | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bratchell | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.01k | £95.98k | £25.17k | £31.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.91k | £38.11k | £58.53k | £37.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN KOLKATA, INDIA, BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CEDARS
PIX FARM LANE
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
- Phone:
- 01442878058
- Email:
- janemanson27@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window