FARLEY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide accommodation for qualifying people within a radius of fifteen miles of The Hospital. We have six single occupancy almshouses and two family cottages, providing much needed homes for old and young alike, in an area with high rental and ownership costs. We don not provide medical attention or any other care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Key | Chair | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Reeve | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Philipps | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jason Colin Reeve | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.53k | £54.66k | £67.66k | £69.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.99k | £39.55k | £62.78k | £69.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMHOUSE ACCOMMODATION IN THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS FARLEY HOSPITAL IN THE PARISH OF PITTON AND FARLEY, WILTSHIRE FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION) RESIDE WITHIN A RADIUS OF 15 MILES FROM THE BUILDINGS OF THE CHARITY AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE PARISH OF PITTON AND FARLEY, THE PARISH OF GRIMSTEAD AND THE LORDSHIP OF MADDINGTON (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farley Hospital
Church Road
Farley
Salisbury
SP5 1AH
- Phone:
- 01722658042
- Email:
- info@farleyhospital.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window