PENTUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our primary purpose is offering regular training and sports therapy sessions, in a safe and supportive environment, working towards participation in an annual Modern Pentathlon event adapted for less experienced athletes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 August 2020: CIO registration
- PENTUP FOUNDATION CIC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN PALLAS | Chair | 25 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Ben Andrew Claxton | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Sweeney | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.70k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £819 | £308 | £449 | £901 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT, BY: 1. ENABLING MILITARY VETERANS, RECOVERING FROM POST-TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER, TO TRAIN FOR AND PARTICIPATE IN, THE SPORT OF MODERN PENTATHLON, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE UK. 2. PROVIDING A COMPANIONSHIP AND SUPPORT NETWORK FOR MILITARY VETERANS RECOVERING FROM PTSD, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 MANOR ROAD
TEDDINGTON
TW11 8AB
- Phone:
- 07768763153
- Email:
- pallas.jonathan@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window