H-ABC FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
H-abc Foundation UK aims to raise awareness of the rare disease H-abc, fund research into a cure and treatment and support families that have received a diagnosis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 13 July 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Yuk Lun Tang | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Esme Candy-Waters | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sheridan-Hill | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michelle Teng | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Hill | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.26k | £51.19k | £28.46k | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.61k | £5.17k | £15.69k | £22.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF HYPOMYELINATION WITH ATROPHY OF BASAL GANGLIA AND CEREBELLUM (H-ABC)SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,BY: - A)PROVIDING HELP, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO FAMILIES FROM OUR OWN EXPERIENCE. B)PROMOTING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF HYPOMYELINATION WITH ATROPHY OF BASAL GANGLIA AND CEREBELLUM (H-ABC) C)SUPPORTING RESEARCH THAT IS DEDICATED TO HYPOMYELINATION WITH ATROPHY OF BASAL GANGLIA AND CEREBELLUM (H-ABC), THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH SHALL BE PUBLISHED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Buxton Avenue
Caversham
Reading
RG4 7BU
- Phone:
- 07961179548
- Email:
- amy@habcfoundationuk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window