MANALI STRAYS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manali Strays UK supports the charitable work of Manali Strays Trust India, an NGO that provides appropriate care (including preventative care in the form of sterilisation to prevent overpopulation and vaccination to prevent disease), treatment, protection, and security for animals in Manali, Himachal Pradesh, India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 18 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Conner | Chair | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Bull | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irma Wouters | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.77k | £8.66k | £15.33k | £12.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.90k | £7.01k | £15.27k | £12.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF MANALI STRAYS TRUST INDIA, AN NGO THAT PROVIDES PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE (INCLUDING PREVENTATIVE CARE IN THE FORM OF STERILISATION TO PREVENT OVERPOPULATION AND VACCINATION TO PREVENT DISEASE), TREATMENT, PROTECTION, AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS IN MANALI, HIMACHAL PRADESH, INDIA WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, AND EDUCATES THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR THE CIO WILL: (A) PROVIDE GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MANALI STRAYS TRUST INDIA; (B) PROVIDE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE ON THE OPERATION AND MANAGEMENT OF MANALI STRAYS TRUST INDIA. (C) ASSIST IN THE RECRUITMENT OF VOLUNTEERS IN THE UK WHO WILL VOLUNTEER AT MANALI STRAYS TRUST INDIA.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Nelson Row
Ford Road
Ford
ARUNDEL
West Sussex
BN18 0DD
- Phone:
- +919418704924
- Email:
- help@manalistrays.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window