MALE SURVIVORS PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a consortium of male survivor services working together to better support male survivors of sexual abuse, rape and sexual exploitation in the UK. We provide a website for survivors and for survivor services, research and share information with other organisations and national bodies, raise awareness of sexual violence against men and boys and improve standards in support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £47,514 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 August 2020: Standard registration
- MSP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Henderson | Chair | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elena Hughes | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Imran Manzoor | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Mike Harthill | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Siobhan Weare | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.94k | £62.44k | £70.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.58k | £64.60k | £78.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.94k | £59.21k | £47.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (’OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND OTHER NON-CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS OPERATING IN THE UK AND UNDERTAKING CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES RELATING TO THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES TO MALE-IDENTIFIED INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY UNWANTED SEXUAL ATTENTION. B) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF MALE-IDENTIFIED INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY UNWANTED SEXUAL ATTENTION. C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF THE SPECIFIC CHARACTERISTICS AND NEEDS OF MALE-IDENTIFIED INDIVIDUALS OF UNWANTED SEXUAL ATTENTION AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. IN THESE OBJECTS ‘UNWANTED SEXUAL ATTENTION’ INCLUDES SEXUAL ABUSE, RAPE, SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OR OTHER UNWANTED SEXUAL ATTENTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Safeline
6a New Street
Warwick
CV34 4RX
- Phone:
- 07518293028
- Email:
- hello@malesurvivor.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window