HERNE BAY ROLLER HOCKEY AND SKATING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the inhabitants of Herne Bay and the surrounding area, the provision of facilities for sport and other leisure time recreation, in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the condition of life of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 21 February 2020: CIO registration
- HERNE BAY RINK HOCKEY CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Harris | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frank Hayes | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olha Hanzlik | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.10k | £24.63k | £30.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.08k | £21.70k | £22.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £850 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £850 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 March 2025 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 March 2025 | 274 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN HERNE BAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING FACILITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN ROLLER HOCKEY, SKATING AND SUCH OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE "FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 CENTRAL AVENUE
HERNE BAY
CT6 8RU
- Phone:
- 07598299774
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window