JEWISH HISTORICAL SOCIETY OF ENGLAND CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history of British Jews and Jewry and particularly Jewish communities connected with it through the course of British history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 March 2020: CIO registration
- 16 December 2022: Funds received from 217331 JEWISH HISTORICAL SOCIETY OF ENGLAND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE MAURICE | Chair | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wallace Jackson Crook | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Frankel | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dawn Waterman | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Merle Rubin | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Schraer | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cobden | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Antony Robin Jeremy Kushner | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL BERKOWITZ | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.18k | £36.90k | £30.32k | £40.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.24k | £49.08k | £41.84k | £41.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF BRITISH JEWS AND JEWRY AND PARTICULARLY OF JEWISH COMMUNITIES CONNECTED WITH IT THROUGH THE COURSE OF BRITISH HISTORY (‘THE SUBJECT’), WHICH OBJECTS SHALL BE ACHIEVED THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES, AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME: (A) THE PROMOTION AND ORGANISATION OF RESEARCH INTO THE SUBJECT AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; (B) THE TRANSCRIPTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THE COLLECTION OF MATERIAL RELATING TO THE SUBJECT; (C) THE PUBLICATION OF DOCUMENTS AND MATERIAL, AS WELL AS OF TREATISES, RELATING TO THE SUBJECT; (D) THE MAINTENANCE OF A LIBRARY AND MUSEUM (WHICH SHALL BE ACCESSIBLE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ON APPLICATION) FOR THE PRESERVATION OF ARCHIVES OF BRITISH JEWISH CONGREGATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS, AND OF DOCUMENTS, BOOKS, PRINTS, AND OTHER OBJECTS OF JEWISH HISTORICAL INTEREST; (E) THE ORGANISATION OF LECTURES AND THE PUBLICATION OF WORKS ON GENERAL JEWISH HISTORY AND LITERATURE; AND FURTHERMORE (F) THE ARCHIVES OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE AVAILABLE TO LEARNED SOCIETIES AND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTES AND THE PUBLIC SHALL BE ENTITLED TO PURCHASE THE SOCIETY'S PUBLISHED PROCEEDINGS AND TREATISES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
K V T Business Care Ltd
Unit 1
Chapelton Lodge
East Winch Road
Blackborough End
KING'S L
- Phone:
- 01553849849
- Email:
- info@jhse.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window