Z. A. I. SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1187313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of a Synagogue and a Centre for Study and Learning for the Jewish Community located in the heart of Stamford Hill, at 95 Stamford Hill London N16. To host various projects celebrating and advancing the Orthodox Jewish Religion in general and Shabbat and Torah Learning in particular. To provide relief of poverty for the local and wider community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £158,598
Total expenditure: £138,328

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ronald Edward Hochhauser Chair 07 December 2019
FRIENDS OF MIR
Received: On time
TREASURED MOMENTS
Received: On time
BEIS BRUCHA LTD
Received: On time
GERALD SINITSKY Trustee 07 December 2019
THE MA'OS YESOMIM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TREASURED MOMENTS
Received: On time
UOHC SUPERVISION LTD
Received: On time
MICHAEL DE JONG Trustee 07 December 2019
FRIENDS OF BIALA LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £138.40k £133.61k £135.41k £158.60k
Total expenditure £97.82k £112.02k £143.81k £138.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 01 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 01 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 02 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Z. A. I. Synagogue
95 - 97 STAMFORD HILL
LONDON
N16 5DN
Phone:
02088081111
Website:

No information available