FRESH START FUTURE ENTERPRISES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fresh Start are a 'Lived Experience' Mentoring & Advocacy service that specifically support individuals who have been through the criminal justice system, we work with prisoners on release from custody, who are in open prisons and people who have been given community orders. We offer support to individuals in Norfolk and Suffolk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £19,667 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN GRINT | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
MAX INKSON | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Miller | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte James | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KERRY NORMAN | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.21k | £114.99k | £135.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.38k | £66.48k | £151.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 September 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 September 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF EX-OFFENDERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING MENTORING, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO HELP EX-OFFENDERS FIND SUSTAINABLE EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING TO HELP THEM TO RE-INTEGRATE INTO THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fresh Start Future Enterprises
Office 20 & 21
60 - 62 Pitt Street
Norwich
NR3 1DF
- Phone:
- 01603273634
- Email:
- mail@fsfe.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window