THE PRESTON GUJRATI MUSLIM SOCIETY, MADINA MOSQUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PLACE OF WORSHIP AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 August 1964: Standard registration
- MEDINA MOSQUE (Working name)
- THE PRESTON GUJRATI MUSLIM SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE PRESTON MUSLIM SOCIETY MADINA MOSQUE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEHBOOB SHETH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YAKUB BAPU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISSA ROKED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.55k | £15.08k | £19.05k | £21.00k | £22.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.33k | £14.50k | £18.75k | £20.32k | £20.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER AS AMENDED 14 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 26 AUGUST 1985.
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND BELIEFS OF THE SUNNI SECT OF MUSLIMS AND TO PROMOTE CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
FISHWICK AND NEW HALL LANE AREA OF PRESTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 William Henry Street
PRESTON
PR1 4XH
- Phone:
- 01772798847
- Email:
- arifvalli@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
madinamasjid.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window