BLACK2NATURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise and run nature camps, events and environmental and sustainable projects engaging BAME children, adults and communities within the South West, South Wales and London. We also provide training and consultancy for organisations within the wider nature, conservation, environmental and education sectors. We campaign for equal access to nature across the UK and for Global Climate Justice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 November 2020: CIO registration
- B2N (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helena Begum Craig | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Afzal Hussain Shah | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syed Murshid Ahmed | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Miriam Davis | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Chikhani | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Sonia Yvonne Morrison | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.00k | £281.03k | £215.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.97k | £175.06k | £187.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR FROM MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES ACROSS THE UK THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR FROM MINORITY ETHNIC COMMUNITIES ACROSS THE UK IN THE SUBJECT OF NATURE, CONSERVATION AND THE ENVIRONMENT. (3) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ACROSS THE UK BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS, (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND ADVANCING DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY RACIAL DIVERSITY WITHIN THE ENVIRONMENTAL SECTOR IN ORDER THAT THEY BETTER REPRESENT THE RACIAL DIVERSITY OF THE UK IN THEIR WORKFORCES, VOLUNTEERS, TRUSTEES, AND MEMBERSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
257 ASHLEY DOWN ROAD
BRISTOL
BS7 9BW
- Phone:
- 07798818772
- Email:
- admin@black2nature.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window