BALLY'S FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Foundation are to preserve and protect the health of persons suffering, or at risk of suffering, from mental health issues. The Foundation furthers its charitable purposes for the public benefit through its grant-making policy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income:
£777,468
Donations and legacies | £777.47k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£856,539
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £856.54k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £856.54k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Ceuta
- Estonia
- Gibraltar
- Hong Kong
- Isle Of Man
- Malta
- Philippines
- Spain
- Sweden
- United States
- Uruguay
Governance
- GAMESYS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.29m | £1.82m | £777.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49m | £2.10m | £856.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.29m | £1.82m | £777.47k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.49m | £2.10m | £856.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.82k | £5.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.49m | £2.07m | £832.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.25m | £2.03m | £1.67m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £448.52k | £1.50m | £1.23m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Feb 2020 as amended on 16 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THE HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING, OR AT RISK OF SUFFERING, FROM MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES BY MAKING GRANTS TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AND MAKING GRANTS TO SUPPORT RESEARCH RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ABOVE, "MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES" MEANS MENTAL ILL-HEALTH OF ALL KINDS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ADDICTION, OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window