Accounts and annual returns GREENWICH TRITONS
Charity number: 1188292

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 617 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 November 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 982 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 November 2022 | 452 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1347 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window