TRING PRODUCTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tring Productions has been set up by a group of professional musicians, writers and performers to bring original, innovative performing arts to Tring and the surrounding area. We aim to devise and promote accessible and first-rate artistic endeavours in several disciplines; our work is focused on music and theatre, but not exclusively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Lark | Chair | 21 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lee | Trustee | 21 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wilkinson | Trustee | 21 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hunter | Trustee | 21 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Holloway | Trustee | 21 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.96k | £1.14k | £8.34k | £205 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.23k | £860 | £8.95k | £4 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PERFORMING ARTS IN TRING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MUSICAL AND THEATRICAL PROJECTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. PROVIDING THE PUBLIC WITH EASY ACCESS TO PROFESSIONAL AND SEMI-PROFESSIONAL PERFORMANCES IN LOCAL VENUES. B. CREATING AND PROMOTING THE REHEARSAL AND PERFORMANCE OF NEW WORK BY LOCAL ARTISTS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, ÆARTISTÆ MEANS A PERSON WHO PRACTISES OR PERFORMS ANY CREATIVE ACTIVITY THAT IS PERFORMED IN FRONT OF AN AUDIENCE. C. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG AND EMERGING ARTISTS, BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO PERFORM IN COLLABORATION WITH MORE EXPERIENCED COLLEAGUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Akeman Street
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 6AN
- Phone:
- 07967511687
- Email:
- info@tringproductions.co.uk
- Website:
-
Tringproductions.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window