GRANDMA'S ATTIC COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support and services to the Blaenau Ffestiniog and wider community
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 06 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Mountford-Tilley | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1008 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1008 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE VILLAGE OF BLAENAU FFESTINIOG FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ARE CAPABLE OF REDUCING THEIR SOCIAL ISOLATION. 2. TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN THE VILLAGE OF BLAENAU FFESTINIOG FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OR THOSE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE OR SAFE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES. 3. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND SEMINARS ON INTERVIEW TECHNIQUES AND EMPLOYABILITY SKILLS AND CLOTHING FOR USE IN INTERVIEWS. 4. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE FROM BLAENAU FFESTINIOG FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A SUMMER CAMP WHICH IS DIRECTED TO DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRANDMAS ATTIC
Market Hall
Commercial Square
Church Street
Blaenau Ffestiniog
LL41 3HP
- Phone:
- 01766830935
- Website:
-
grandmas.attic.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window