GOODNEWS CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
religion activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 02 June 2020: CIO registration
- GCC (Working name)
- GCC, WALSALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Omoyeni | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Olamigoke Olorunnisola Ifarajimi | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Joshua Ayodeji Akinbode | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayode Olayinka | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olaitan Oludayo Ogalar | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Kadie Doris Hennie Conteh | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.19k | £2.20k | £3.65k | £16.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.82k | £3.10k | £6.55k | £12.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF CHURCH MEETINGS, PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD AND OTHER METHODS OF COMMUNICATION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (2) TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE THAT IS SET OUT IN OUR STATEMENT OF FAITH AND PRACTICE BY MEANS OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE, AUDIO, VISUAL PRODUCTS, COMPUTER-BASED LEARNING, CLASSES, MENTIONING AND BUILDING MEN AND WOMEN. (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING CARE AND SUPPORT FOR THE NEEDY. AND BY WORKING WITH OTHER CHARITIES AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO OFFER HELP BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE. WE WILL ASSIST VICTIMS OF WAR AND THE SICK BOTH LOCALLY AND NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOODNEWS CHRISTIAN CENTRE
RYECROFT COMMUNITY HUB
28 New Forest Road
WALSALL
WS3 1TR
- Phone:
- 07533584715
- Email:
- writeus.gcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
goodnewschristiancentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window