UK PARANORMAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK Paranormal Society aims to inform, educate and protect the public and heritage locations who are affected by or interested in the subject of the paranormal; and those practising in the paranormal field. To achieve this, we will provide a source of reliable information and guidance; promote good ethical practices; raise awareness of scientific research and encourage further research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.29k | £1.39k | £3.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.17k | £1.30k | £2.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Apr 2021 as amended on 13 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
1) The protection of the public, particularly those who are vulnerable, from harm caused by misinformation, malpractice and exploitation relating to the paranormal. This will be achieved, in particular but not exclusively, by: a) the provision of appropriate information and guidance to help inform and protect the public; b) the promotion of ethical standards of conduct for paranormal practitioners who are providing paranormal-related services, help or support to members of the public in the UK; and c) promoting and raising awareness of scientific research into the subject of the paranormal by raising public awareness of existing scientific research and encouraging additional scientific research into the subject. 2) For the public benefit, the preservation and protection of heritage locations and their history from harm caused by misinformation, malpractice and exploitation relating to the paranormal. This will be achieved, in particular but not exclusively, by: a) the provision of appropriate information and guidance in the use of heritage locations for paranormal-related purposes; b) the promotion of ethical standards of conduct for paranormal practitioners who are accessing, using or interacting with heritage locations in the UK, for paranormal-related purposes; and c) promoting and raising awareness of scientific research into the subject of the paranormal by raising public awareness of existing scientific research and encouraging additional scientific research into the subject.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window