TAMIL SPECIAL CHILDREN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parental workshops, Park gatherings, Events and parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 August 2020: CIO registration
- TSC UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Krishanthy Narayanamoorthy | Chair | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Florina Kalaimaran | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thavarupan Thavarajah | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malarvili Thanansayan | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thirunavukkarasu Prabaharan | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Subothini Sivendrakumar | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10.88k | £21.48k | £28.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £115 | £3.15k | £9.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH THE TAMIL COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR LEARNING DISABILITY/DIFFICULTY, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO THE TAMIL SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: O RAISING THE TAMIL COMMUNITYÆS AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES/DIFFICULTIES, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION; O PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT FOR TAMIL PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES/DIFFICULTIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. ''LEARNING DISABILITY'' MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 GLOUCESTER ROAD
LONDON
E17 6AE
- Phone:
- 07984551684
- Email:
- selvakris@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window