SUSTAINING HARMONY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need by reason of ill mental health and their carers , in particular but not exclusively by providing the opportunity to take part and perform in a choir with others affected by mental health issues and support groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Charles Bell | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Noel Ovens | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Jean Lamiman | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cressida Leonora Lindsay | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Brecker CA | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.42k | £1.19k | £5.10k | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160 | £2.96k | £3.10k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL MENTAL HEALTH AND THEIR CARERS , IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY TO TAKE PART AND PERFORM IN A CHOIR WITH OTHERS AFFECTED BY MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND SUPPORT GROUPS TO HELP ALLEVIATE THE MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES THEY FACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Beeton Close
Pinner
HA5 4NZ
- Phone:
- 02081910533
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window