Financial history THE UNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 515412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £871.19k £913.44k £990.27k £1.04m £1.03m
Total expenditure £870.23k £832.01k £948.81k £1.02m £1.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £215.09k £21.03k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £871.19k £698.35k £943.41k £1.04m £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £215.09k £46.87k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £870.23k £832.01k £948.81k £1.02m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £56.69k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0