WULFRUNA LAND & WATER LIFESAVERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Members are aged from age 8 years old. The children progress through the RLSS lifesaving awards which allow them to become part of our patrol team who provide water safety cover at various river and lake-based events. We enter lifesaving competitions, in swimming pools. We have a Community First Responder Section and a Search & Rescue section which over 18's can train for.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- WLWLS (Working name)
- Wolverhampton Prepared (Working name)
- Wolverhampton Save a Life (Working name)
- Wulfruna CFRs (Working name)
- Wulfruna Lifesavers (Working name)
- Wulfruna Rescue (Working name)
- Wulfruna Search & Rescue (Working name)
- FastAid Wulfruna (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian John McDowell | Chair | 11 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Zoe Brown | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Spindler | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Mary Chambers | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £10.48k | £8.05k | £1.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £525 | £4.85k | £7.15k | £146 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 December 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 December 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED IS TO FURTHER THE SAVING OF LIVES, WHETHER BY PREVENTION OR RESCUE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: 1. BY PROMOTING WATER SAFETY PRACTICES IN ALL ASPECTS OF WATER ACTIVITIES. 2. BY PROVIDING A VOLUNTARY LIFEGUARD SERVICE TO THE COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC AT LARGE 3. BY PROVIDING VOLUNTARY COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONSE TO THE COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC AT LARGE 4. BY PROVIDING AQUATIC LIFESAVING AND SEARCH AND RESCUE QUALIFICATIONS 5. BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN WATER SAFETY, RESCUE, LIFESAVING, COACHING, RESUSCITATION, AND FIRST AID. 6. BY PROVIDING LIFESAVING SAFETY AWARENESS AND PREVENTION OF DROWNING GUIDANCE AND INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD
SECOND AVENUE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV10 9PE
- Phone:
- 01902864880
- Email:
- wulfrunalifesavers@gmail.com
- Website:
-
wulfrunalifesavers.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window