THE MOUNTAIN OF SALVATION MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises awareness of Christian religious beliefs and practices via church services, communal gatherings, meetings and other (via social media). The purpose is the advancement of the Christian faith according to Cherubim & Seraphim Church of Christ principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 20 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Olayinka Agboola | Chair | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Grace Adams | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olamide Titilola Agboola | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.35k | £18.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.75k | £19.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2023 | 380 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2023 | 380 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2023 | 745 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2023 | 745 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1 AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHARTWELL LTD
MOUNTAIN OF SALVATION MINISTRIES
BLOCK H - ARCH 5
61-65 PAULET ROAD
LONDON
SE5 9HW
- Phone:
- 07944405765
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window