THE MANNA HOUSE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to further the following purpose within a Christian ethos: the relief and prevention of poverty in Blackheath and the surrounding area by means of food provision, information and advice and any other means deemed appropriate by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sandwell
Governance
- 24 March 2020: CIO registration
- THE MANNA HOUSE PANTRY CIO (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Healthcare Inspectorate Wales (HIW)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Crumpton | Chair | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Philip Shaw | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Priest | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Patton | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Moira Shelton | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.33k | £25.98k | £41.10k | £61.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.71k | £31.22k | £37.17k | £48.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO FURTHER THE FOLLOWING PURPOSE WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS: THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF POVERTY IN BLACKHEATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY MEANS OF FOOD PROVISION, INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND ANY OTHER MEANS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72A VICARAGE ROAD
HALESOWEN
B62 8HX
- Phone:
- 01384565111
- Email:
- mannahouse72a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window