NEW ENGLAND WOOD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve, protect and conserve the New England Wood, Cuckfield, West Sussex for the public benefit and as broadleaf woodland. To establish, form, maintain and manage for the public benefit a nature reserve for the conservation and control of wild plants and other vegetation and of the wild creatures of any description living naturally therein.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- 21 June 2022: Funds received from 283188 NEW ENGLAND WOOD TRUST
- NEWT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Thomas Boyle | Chair | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ANTHONY FAAS | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Joseph Ward | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Robert Burton | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Mary Crabtree D.Phil | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Douglas Church | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Letschka B.A.,M.A. | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Newnham B.Sc. | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James William Grieve B.Sc | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ross Norman Bradshaw | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £10.23k | £8.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £4.30k | £14.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE, PROTECT AND CONSERVE THE NEW ENGLAND WOOD, CUCKFIELD, WEST SUSSEX FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND AS BROADLEAF WOODLAND. TO ESTABLISH, FORM, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT A NATURE RESERVE FOR THE CONSERVATION AND CONTROL OF WILD PLANTS AND OTHER VEGETATION AND OF THE WILD CREATURES OF ANY DESCRIPTION LIVING NATURALLY THEREIN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Garden House
Courtmead Road
Cuckfield
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH17 5LP
- Phone:
- 07767227019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window