ELLISTOWN SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 515417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are part of the national scouting movement, providing fun and education for young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £12,112
Total expenditure: £13,866

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 1984: Standard registration
  • 09 August 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 21 September 2016: Re-registered
  • 09 August 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 07 September 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maxine Dennis Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Christine Eyssade Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Toby Reeve Trustee 09 July 2020
None on record
Deborah Jane George Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Peter James Smalley Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Richard Douglas Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £19.27k £17.03k £23.48k £10.30k £12.11k
Total expenditure £19.58k £9.85k £6.91k £13.78k £13.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.45k £10.00k £19.00k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 22 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 27 April 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 24 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 Jackson road
Bagworth
Bagworth
Leicestershire
LE67 1HL
Phone:
07960116333