THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOCKING FARM AND BEAUMONT LEYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As part of the Church of England we provide public worship. We operate a food bank at Christ the King Church. We run groups for the elderly and isolated. Our building are used by several groups offering preschool, tutoring, sessions for the disabled, karate and other activities. We have links with a number of local primary schools, taking assemblies or hosting their "Carol" service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £22,250 from 6 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
Governance
- 21 February 2020: Standard registration
- CHRIST THE KING, BEAUMONT LEYS (Working name)
- Food Bank @ Christ the King, Beaumont Leys (Working name)
- ST LUKE'S, STOCKING FARM (Working name)
- STOCKING FARM AND BEAUMONT LEYS PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Charles Hinsley | Chair | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcie Hayley Gent | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Peter Gent | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Gordon | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dixon | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Erica Wray | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Mary Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Trevor David Hesselwood B Eng | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Alice Hesselwood | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS ARTHUR HEMSLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Brenda Mary Shepherd | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Whitehead | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Thomas Whitehead | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.55k | £105.79k | £103.62k | £104.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.52k | £128.21k | £152.34k | £124.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | £20.34k | £25.00k | £22.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF CHRIST THE KING
BEAUMONT WAY
LEICESTER
LE4 1DS
- Phone:
- 0116 235 9288
- Email:
- sf.and.bl.p.c.c@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window