CREDINTA TARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise awareness and understanding of Christian beliefs and practises by providing camps and international missionary outreach including teaching and devotional acts of Christianity, at times acting to relieve poverty through the provision of items such as clothing, items for improvement of quality of life and provision of resources and funds for educational benefit of children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Romania
Governance
- 03 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Lindsay Bennett | Chair | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrei Pacurar | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rozalia Mihaela Bennett | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Barbu | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79k | £2.14k | £5.21k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £1.59k | £5.01k | £2.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND PRACTISES BY PROVIDING CAMPS AND INTERNATIONAL MISSIONARY OUTREACH INCLUDING TEACHING AND DEVOTIONAL ACTS OF CHRISTIANITY, IN FULFILLING THIS PURPOSE THE CIO WILL AT TIMES ACT TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS SUCH AS CLOTHING, ITEMS FOR IMPROVEMENT OF QUALITY OF LIFE AND PROVISION OF RESOURCES AND FUNDS FOR EDUCATIONAL BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Hilltop Avenue
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 1TY
- Phone:
- 074620608208
- Email:
- info@credintatare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window