SKY FULL OF STORIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sky Full Of Stories utilises the performance arts, storytelling and music to help combat social isolation in marginalised people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 August 2020: CIO registration
- SFOS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Ronchetti | Chair | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Arlborough | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Hazel Sherman | Trustee | 28 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.32k | £21.17k | £28.64k | £35.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.18k | £20.60k | £29.13k | £32.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY, AGE, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC POSITION OR SOME OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY: - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PARTICIPATION IN THE PERFORMING ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH MUSIC AND MULTI-SENSORY STORYTELLING AND PRACTITIONER TRAINING WORKSHOPS; - THE ACTIVE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY DETERRING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, ASSISTING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND SUPPORTING THEM TO INTEGRATE WITH SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 7
WINSLAR
I LADYBOWER ROAD
WORTHING
WEST SUSSEX
BN13 3NU
- Phone:
- 07504628442
- Email:
- SKYFULLOFSTORIES@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window