THE GURU NANAK GURDWARA WARRINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the principles of Sikh religion and customs,to establish or to secure the establishment of a Gurdwara.Religious, social and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Warrington
Governance
- 01 August 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARAN SINGH | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
HARJIT SINGH TOOR | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
KULDEEP SINGH DHILLON | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
piloo singh | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DALJIT SINGH JOHAL | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.13k | £28.74k | £44.81k | £68.69k | £96.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.37k | £38.45k | £116.65k | £37.01k | £68.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 November 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 November 2024 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 235 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2021 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2021 | 236 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/07/1984 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2009
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE PRINCIPLES OF SIKH RELIGION AND CUSTOMS. (2) TO ESTABLISH A GURDWARA. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WARRINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WORK FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WARRINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GURU NANAK GURDWARA
DOVER ROAD
LATCHFORD
WARRINGTON
WA4 1NW
- Phone:
- 01925418208
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window