SANDS END ARTS & COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity maintains and manages an arts and community centre for use by all the people living in or near Sands End, Fulham, London. It provides a meeting place, community cafe, facilities for arts, health and well being activities, leisure pursuits and a home for community events. It is run by local trustees who will ensure that everyone is welcome and that the centre is accessible to all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £84,713 from 6 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 20 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Paul Prager | Chair | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Fisher | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Coleman MP | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Geoffrey Goddard | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Henderson | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.25k | £421.89k | £332.48k | £463.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.39k | £257.12k | £369.54k | £441.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £185.00k | £6.80k | £84.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SANDS END AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE ARTS, EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ARTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE IT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sands End Arts & Community Centre
Peterborough Rd
Fulham
London
SW6 3EZ
- Phone:
- 02031969431
- Email:
- welcome@seacc.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window