ASSISTANCE DOG ASSESSMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a UK based charity that provides independent assessment of assistance dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsten Dillon A.Dip CBM | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Becki Gude | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Mearns | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Selina Valentine | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Gorbing | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Sandra Fraser | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £452 | £805 | £6.74k | £16.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49 | £856 | £4.68k | £5.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES WHO DEPEND ON A PRIVATELY TRAINED ASSISTANCE DOG FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROVIDING AN INDEPENDENT ASSESSMENT AND ACCREDITATION TO ENABLE SUCH PEOPLE TO USE THE ASSISTANCE DOG IN ACCESSING PUBLIC SPACES SUCH AS SUPERMARKETS, RESTAURANTS OR ON PUBLIC TRANSPORT WITH CONFIDENCE; (B) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES WHO DEPEND ON ASSISTANCE DOGS IN PUBLIC PLACES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Bridge Street
Kington
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07340555647
- Email:
- info@theadaa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window